Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Smith, Sonya, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Jimenez, S Antonio, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Smith, Emily Kathleen, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with McCarthy, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Sonya Smith against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The complaint alleges that there was a homeowners insurance policy in effect, but the insured does not have a copy of the policy. The insured claims that ...
Order
Date: March 02, 2020Order Resetting
Date: March 02, 2020Exhibits
Date: March 05, 2020Exhibits
Date: March 05, 2020Exhibits
Date: March 05, 2020Exhibits
Date: March 05, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: March 27, 2020Exhibits
Date: March 05, 2020Exhibits
Date: March 05, 2020Exhibits
Date: March 05, 2020Exhibits
Date: March 05, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: March 09, 2020Objection to Request to Produce
Date: April 17, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: March 27, 2020Letter From
Date: March 31, 2020Order Resetting
Date: March 31, 2020Response to Motion
Date: April 14, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: April 03, 2020Order Resetting
Date: April 30, 2020Notice of Filing
Date: April 17, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: April 22, 2020Order
Date: April 27, 2020Motion for Entry
Date: April 28, 2020Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 04, 2020Agreed Order
Date: May 06, 2020Order to Compel
Date: May 08, 2020Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 08, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 14, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: May 14, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 15, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: June 01, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: June 03, 2020Notice of Cancellation
Date: June 05, 2020Request for Production
Date: October 20, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: June 25, 2020Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 18, 2020Order Resetting
Date: August 20, 2020Notice of Service
Date: October 20, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 30, 2020Order Resetting
Date: January 18, 2021Answer to Interrogs
Date: February 04, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 19, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: February 03, 2021Motion in Limine
Date: March 23, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: February 04, 2021Motion in Limine
Date: March 23, 2021Motion in Limine
Date: March 23, 2021Motion in Limine
Date: March 23, 2021Motion in Limine
Date: March 23, 2021Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: April 23, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: June 15, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 12, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 12, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 14, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: April 09, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: May 29, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: July 30, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: October 19, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: October 31, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: November 07, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: November 07, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: July 12, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 07, 2018Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: August 30, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: October 02, 2019Exhibits
Date: October 11, 2019Witness List
Date: October 11, 2019Expert Witness List
Date: October 11, 2019Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: November 04, 2019Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: December 02, 2019Expert Witness List
Date: December 04, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: January 07, 2020Notice of Video Deposition
Date: February 03, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 03, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 03, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 03, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 03, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 03, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 03, 2020Notice of Video Deposition
Date: February 03, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: March 05, 2020Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 11, 2020Response to Motion
Date: March 27, 2020Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: March 27, 2020Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 17, 2020Motion for Continuance
Date: April 23, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 30, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 30, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 30, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 30, 2020Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: February 02, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: February 08, 2021Motion in Limine
Date: March 23, 2021Motion in Limine
Date: March 23, 2021Motion in Limine
Date: March 23, 2021Exhibits
Date: March 05, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: April 30, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 12, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: November 07, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 03, 2020Exhibits
Date: March 05, 2020Order Resetting
Date: April 20, 2021Notice of Unavailability
Date: April 28, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: April 28, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Interrogatories
Date: January 12, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 12, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 12, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 23, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 14, 2018Request for Production of Documents
Date: January 12, 2018Order Granting
Date: June 26, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: June 14, 2018Motion for Judgment
Date: July 10, 2018Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: July 16, 2019Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: August 02, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: July 30, 2018Response to Motion for Judgment
Date: November 07, 2018Request to Produce
Date: August 06, 2019Certificate
Date: August 26, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: August 06, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: August 21, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: September 06, 2019Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: September 10, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: September 10, 2019Response to Motion to Compel
Date: October 15, 2019Order
Date: October 16, 2019Certificate
Date: October 11, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: October 30, 2019Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: October 22, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: October 23, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: November 15, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 19, 2019Witness & Exhibit List
Date: November 04, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: November 15, 2019Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: November 15, 2019Request for Production
Date: November 15, 2019Motion
Date: November 18, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: November 21, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: November 25, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: November 25, 2019Objection
Date: November 18, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 25, 2019Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: January 27, 2020Mediation Report
Date: December 04, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: December 16, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: December 09, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: January 16, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 06, 2020Notice of Unavailability
Date: January 27, 2020Notice of Cancellation
Date: January 27, 2020Notice of Video Deposition
Date: February 03, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 03, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 03, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 03, 2020Notice of Video Deposition
Date: February 03, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 03, 2020Letter From
Date: February 21, 2020Notice of Cancellation
Date: February 20, 2020Notice of Cancellation
Date: February 03, 2020Order Extending Time
Date: February 04, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: February 03, 2020Notice of Cancellation
Date: February 06, 2020Order
Date: February 10, 2020Motion for Continuance
Date: February 27, 2020Letter to Judge
Date: February 27, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Discovery Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting trial |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF OTHER LAWSUITS AND CLAIMSParty: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine OR ARGUMENT REGARDING GOOD OR BAD FAITH CLAIMS HANDLINGParty: Plaintiff Smith, Sonya |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Party: Plaintiff Smith, Sonya |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine TO EXCLUDE ANY COMPARISON OF THE SUBJECT INSURANCE POLICY TO A MAINTENANCE CONTRACT AND/OR ANY ARGMENT OR COMMENTARY SUGGESTING PLAINTIFF IS ATTEMPTING TO TREAT OR USE THE SUBJECT POLICY AS A MAINTNANCE CONTRACTParty: Plaintiff Smith, Sonya |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine TO EXCLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO DEFENDANTS' ADJUSTERS AS AN "INDEPENDENT ADJUSTERParty: Plaintiff Smith, Sonya |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.