Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Collins Asset Group Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Avrutis, Thomas L, against Buitrago , Vladimir, represented by Humphrey, Aaron, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Singer, Michele Towbin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by COLLINS ASSET GROUP, LLC against VLADIMIR BUITRAGO. The plaintiff alleges that BUITRAGO executed and delivered a Promissory Note to AAMES FUNDING CORPORATION DBA AAMES HOME LOAN on December 1, 2005. The plaintiff, COLLINS A...
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 12, 2018Motion for Default & Default
Date: February 21, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: February 20, 2018Cross Notice
Date: December 11, 2018Motion for Continuance
Date: December 11, 2018Affidavit in Support
Date: February 05, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 12, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 25, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: February 21, 2018Affidavit of Interest
Date: February 22, 2018Motion for Default Final Judgment
Date: February 22, 2018Notice
Date: February 22, 2018Affidavit in Support
Date: February 22, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 28, 2018Request to Produce
Date: March 21, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: March 21, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: March 21, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: March 21, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 20, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: June 20, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: June 20, 2018Affidavit in Support
Date: July 27, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: June 20, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: July 27, 2018Affidavit of Interest
Date: July 27, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: August 28, 2018Motion to Set Aside Default
Date: December 11, 2018Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: December 11, 2018Agreed Order
Date: January 02, 2019Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 04, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: February 06, 2019Order
Date: April 28, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: June 08, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: November 07, 2019Motion to Withdraw
Date: November 07, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: November 25, 2019Settlement Agreement
Date: December 31, 2019Motion for Final Judgment
Date: February 05, 2021Notice
Date: March 10, 2021Motion for Garnishment After Judgment
Date: September 09, 2021Answer of Garnishee
Date: October 07, 2021eWrit Issuance - Garnishment
Date: September 30, 2021Writ of Garnishment Returned Served
Date: October 07, 2021Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment
Date: October 29, 2021Notice of Garnishment
Date: October 07, 2021Order Dissolving Writ of Garnishment
Date: November 03, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: May 21, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Dissolving Writ of Garnishment | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment Party: Plaintiff Collins Asset Group LLC |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer of Garnishee Garnishee, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A/ATTORNEY JOSEPH A NOA JR ESQ FBN:81984 |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment Returned Served BANK OF AMERICA N. A. |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Garnishment | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
eWrit Issuance - Garnishment DEFT Vladimir Buitrago/Garnishee Bank of America National Association/$45,410.88 |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Garnishment After Judgment Garnishee Bank of America National AssociationParty: Plaintiff Collins Asset Group LLC |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF MAILINGParty: Plaintiff Collins Asset Group LLC |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit in Support | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Final Judgment Party: Plaintiff Collins Asset Group LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.