Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Food Marketing Consultants Inc, New Albertson'S Lp, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Silverberg, Paul K, against Albertsons Llc, Food Marketing Consultants, New Albertson'S Lp, Safeway Inc, represented by Goldstein, Glenn Evan, Lee, Eric, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Food Marketing Consultants, Inc. d/b/a San Bernardo against Albertson's, LLC and Safeway, Inc. The plaintiff is a Florida corporation that sells ice cream products under the brand San Bernardo. The defendants are foreign en...
Motion for Contempt
Date: September 29, 2020Witness List
Date: September 29, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: October 02, 2020Notice of Service
Date: December 23, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: April 09, 2021Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 23, 2021Notice of Expert Witnesses
Date: December 10, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 20, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 30, 2022Witness List
Date: September 28, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 09, 2021Notice of Withdrawal
Date: May 09, 2021Witness List
Date: May 27, 2021Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 06, 2021Witness List
Date: February 24, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 12, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 26, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 14, 2018Interrogatories
Date: March 10, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 14, 2018Agreed Order
Date: February 15, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 19, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: April 25, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 25, 2018Order
Date: July 10, 2018Interrogatories
Date: June 05, 2018Notice of Service
Date: July 05, 2018Interrogatories
Date: October 05, 2018Agreed Order
Date: October 08, 2018Interrogatories
Date: February 04, 2019Request to Produce
Date: February 06, 2019Order Denying
Date: January 29, 2019Answer Affirmative Defenses & Counterclaim
Date: February 18, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 06, 2019Request for Production of Documents
Date: April 24, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 06, 2019Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: May 24, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: May 24, 2019Motion to Compel Production
Date: July 02, 2019Agreed Order
Date: September 18, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: July 17, 2019Notice of Service
Date: November 06, 2019Notice of Service
Date: November 14, 2019Order
Date: November 27, 2019Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories
Date: November 20, 2019Order Setting
Date: November 27, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: January 31, 2020Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Date: January 28, 2020Motion to Compel/Impose Sanctions
Date: January 30, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: May 08, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: June 02, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 01, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 04, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: July 29, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: July 30, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 22, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 18, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: August 19, 2020Memorandum in Opposition
Date: September 03, 2020Motion for Leave to File
Date: August 18, 2020Response to Memorandum
Date: September 04, 2020Order Extending Time
Date: September 16, 2020Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 08, 2020Third Amended Complaint
Date: September 11, 2020Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 15, 2020Notice of Service
Date: September 25, 2020Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 02, 2020Interrogatories
Date: November 23, 2020Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: September 30, 2020Notice of Filing
Date: December 03, 2020Answer and Counterclaim
Date: December 02, 2020Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: December 14, 2020Motion for Extension of Time
Date: December 23, 2020Notice of Filing
Date: January 05, 2021Motion for Continuance
Date: December 28, 2020Order Extending Time
Date: December 28, 2020Notice of Service
Date: January 12, 2021Calendar Call-Order Resetting Trial
Date: January 11, 2021Notice of Compliance
Date: January 12, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: December 30, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: February 09, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: January 15, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: February 23, 2021Order Compelling Discovery
Date: February 25, 2021Amended Witness List
Date: February 21, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 24, 2021Notice of Service
Date: March 24, 2021Memorandum in Opposition
Date: March 31, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: March 31, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 09, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 21, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 16, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 21, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 19, 2021Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories
Date: July 20, 2021Agreed Order Granting
Date: July 26, 2021Motion for Continuance
Date: July 22, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: July 30, 2021Notice of Service
Date: July 28, 2021Stipulation
Date: August 17, 2021Affidavit in Support
Date: July 30, 2021Notice
Date: August 18, 2021Request
Date: August 24, 2021Emergency Motion
Date: August 24, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: August 25, 2021Request
Date: August 24, 2021Order Granting Rehearing & Resetting
Date: August 25, 2021Order Denying Motion to Strike
Date: August 30, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 31, 2021Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 10, 2021Amended Order
Date: November 01, 2021Statement of Facts
Date: March 30, 2022Notice of Expert Witnesses
Date: November 05, 2021Calendar Call-Order Resetting Trial
Date: November 02, 2021Calendar Call-Order Resetting Trial
Date: November 05, 2021Amended Witness List
Date: March 16, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 24, 2022Amended Order
Date: January 28, 2022Statement of Facts
Date: March 30, 2022Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: March 23, 2022Expert Witness List
Date: March 25, 2022Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: March 23, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: April 04, 2022Notice of Filing Deposition
Date: March 30, 2022Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 12, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Service
Date: April 09, 2018Answer to Interrogs
Date: April 25, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: May 29, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 07, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: June 14, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 17, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: August 28, 2018Request for Production
Date: October 05, 2018Notice of Service
Date: October 05, 2018Second Amended Complaint
Date: October 05, 2018Motion to Dismiss 2nd Amended Complaint
Date: October 15, 2018Answer to Interrogs
Date: November 13, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: November 13, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: November 28, 2018Agreed Order
Date: December 28, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 28, 2019Notice of Service
Date: March 08, 2019Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 11, 2019Notice of Service
Date: March 16, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: April 11, 2019Notice
Date: April 29, 2019Order Extending Time
Date: May 28, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: May 29, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 31, 2019Notice
Date: June 21, 2019Notice
Date: June 21, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: August 05, 2019Interrogatories
Date: September 20, 2019Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: October 02, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 21, 2019Order
Date: November 04, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: November 27, 2019Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: December 02, 2019Notice of Service
Date: December 03, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: December 05, 2019Order
Date: December 17, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 08, 2020Response to Motion
Date: January 10, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: January 09, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: January 17, 2020Answer to Interrogs
Date: January 17, 2020Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: January 31, 2020Agreed Order
Date: February 20, 2020Order Granting Motion
Date: January 31, 2020Notice Setting Mediation
Date: March 10, 2020Order
Date: February 20, 2020Order Granting Motion to Withdraw
Date: April 10, 2020Witness List
Date: April 23, 2020Motion for Extension of Time
Date: May 05, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: May 05, 2020Motion for Continuance
Date: May 13, 2020Order Extending Time
Date: May 18, 2020Response to Motion
Date: May 20, 2020Notice of Mediation
Date: May 22, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 26, 2020Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Date: May 29, 2020Order Granting Motion
Date: June 01, 2020Certificate
Date: June 05, 2020Mediation Report
Date: June 18, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: July 23, 2020Calendar Call-Order Resetting Trial
Date: June 23, 2020Motion
Date: August 07, 2020Opposition
Date: August 24, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: August 24, 2020Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: August 25, 2020Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 23, 2020Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: October 27, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: October 22, 2020Motion for Extension of Time
Date: December 11, 2020Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: December 14, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: February 08, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: February 18, 2021Affidavit in Support
Date: March 31, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: July 20, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: July 27, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 26, 2021Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 02, 2021Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: August 23, 2021Motion for Emergency Hearing
Date: August 24, 2021Amended
Date: October 07, 2021Amended Order
Date: October 08, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: October 21, 2021Joint Stipulation
Date: October 26, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 30, 2022Witness List
Date: June 22, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: August 26, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: May 14, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 21, 2020Notice of Unavailability
Date: September 17, 2021Motion to Withdraw
Date: April 10, 2020Interrogatories
Date: August 07, 2020Amended Complaint
Date: July 05, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: October 24, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: August 17, 2020Notice
Date: June 17, 2020Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: May 18, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMSParty: Defendant New Albertson's LP |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Statement of Facts IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ITS COUNTERCLAIMParty: Defendant New Albertson's LP |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Statement of Facts IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMSParty: Defendant New Albertson's LP |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Deposition | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment ON ITS COUNTERCLAIMParty: Defendant New Albertson's LP |
|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Expert Witness List | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Substitution of Counsel | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel Party: Defendant New Albertson's LP |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Amended Witness List |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.