Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ramhofer, Will, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Fernandez, Jessica U, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Rodriguez, Lazaro C, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Will Ramhofer against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The complaint alleges that there was a homeowners insurance policy in effect, with the policy number not provided, that covered the property located at ...
Notice of Filing Interrogs
Date: January 12, 2018Request for Production of Documents
Date: January 12, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 12, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 12, 2018Motion
Date: June 25, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 19, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: May 16, 2018Consent to Substitution of Counsel
Date: May 16, 2018Order On Motion to Strike
Date: June 06, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: August 28, 2018Agreed Order
Date: August 20, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 17, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: August 28, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: September 19, 2018Order
Date: August 20, 2018Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: October 03, 2018Agreed Order
Date: October 15, 2018Motion
Date: October 17, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: October 17, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: October 23, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 25, 2018Expert Witness List
Date: February 05, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: March 12, 2019Expert Witness List
Date: March 20, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: April 23, 2019Order Denying Motion to Strike
Date: April 30, 2019Notice of Conflict
Date: April 26, 2019Order Denying Motion to Strike
Date: April 30, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 01, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 08, 2019Mediation Report
Date: May 15, 2019Request to Produce
Date: June 07, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: July 31, 2019Motion
Date: July 10, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 19, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: February 06, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: August 20, 2019Request for Admissions
Date: January 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 11, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 11, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 15, 2018Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 26, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: June 05, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: June 25, 2018Notice for/of Trial
Date: August 17, 2018Motion for Sanctions
Date: September 13, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 12, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 17, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: October 17, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: October 18, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: December 13, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: December 10, 2018Witness & Exhibit List
Date: January 04, 2019Motion to Compel/Impose Sanctions
Date: December 10, 2018Certificate
Date: February 12, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: March 12, 2019Exhibit List
Date: March 20, 2019Witness List
Date: March 20, 2019Request to Produce
Date: March 12, 2019Motion to Strike Expert Witness
Date: April 02, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: April 09, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: April 08, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: April 10, 2019Motion to Strike
Date: April 02, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 10, 2019Order Granting Motion to Strike
Date: April 30, 2019Motion for Continuance
Date: April 30, 2019Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 29, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 07, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: July 03, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: September 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Ramhofer, Will Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCEParty: Plaintiff Ramhofer, Will |
|
June 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Request to Produce | |
June 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.