Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-4, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Salomone, Kenneth Louis, against Londono , Pablo A, represented by Serra, Steven R, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by the plaintiff, National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-4, against the defendant, Pablo A Londono. The plaintiff is seeking damages in the amount of $42,239.42, exclusive of court costs and interest. The defendant is a r...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 20, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 12, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 12, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 07, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 07, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 10, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 17, 2018Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: April 30, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 22, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 12, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 03, 2018Notice of Firm Name Change
Date: October 03, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 28, 2018Affidavit in Opposition
Date: May 01, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation OF HEARING |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Firm Name Change | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit in Opposition | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Hearing | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Londono , Pablo A |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Party: Plaintiff National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-4 |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO FILE RESPONSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.