Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Nicholson, Juliette, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Zoeller, William D, against Lubow, Scott, Lubow, Stephen, represented by Luces, Ricardo M, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Juliette Nicholson against Scott Lubow and Stephen Lubow in the Circuit Court of the Seventh Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The complaint seeks damages in excess of $15,000. The plaintiff, Juliette Nicholson, ...
Amended Complaint
Date: March 14, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 10, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 16, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 12, 2018Request to Produce
Date: January 12, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 12, 2018Notice of Filing Interrogs
Date: January 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 12, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 12, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 13, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 02, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 13, 2018Request to Produce
Date: March 14, 2018eSummons Issuance - On Amended
Date: March 14, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: March 21, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 22, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 10, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 11, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: April 24, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: September 19, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: April 25, 2018Request to Produce
Date: April 26, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 24, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: April 27, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 16, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: May 17, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: July 17, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: November 15, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 16, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: August 06, 2018Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 07, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: August 15, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: August 20, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: September 10, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: September 04, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: August 31, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 28, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: August 28, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: May 17, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: September 21, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: September 25, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 25, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: October 29, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 28, 2019Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: April 19, 2019Joint Stipulation
Date: June 20, 2019Summons Returned Served
Date: February 02, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: March 14, 2018Notice of Filing Interrogs
Date: March 14, 2018Order Denying Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 14, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 10, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 24, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: April 26, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: April 26, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: May 02, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: May 10, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 17, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: June 12, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 17, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: August 01, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: August 02, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: August 07, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: August 09, 2018Return of Service Served
Date: August 13, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: August 24, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 05, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 28, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: March 20, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 01, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: March 27, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 02, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: April 19, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: April 09, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO NON PARTY NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY CLAIM FILE REOCRDSParty: Defendant Lubow, Scott |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.