Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Liotta, Michelle, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Levine, Glen B., Esq., against Arbuthnot, Michael J, Arregui, Antero, Rb Knot Inc, represented by Arocha, Crystal, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haury, William W., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Michelle Liotta, as the parent and next friend of Chelsy Elvir, a minor, against the defendants Antero Arregui, Michael J. Arbuthnot, and R.B. Knot, Inc. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of the defendants and se...
Request for Admissions
Date: January 12, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 12, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 12, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 12, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 12, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 12, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 12, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 12, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 01, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: March 01, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: March 01, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 02, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: April 13, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: May 14, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: May 01, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: May 08, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: May 15, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 15, 2018Notice of Compliance
Date: July 26, 2018Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: August 09, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: August 29, 2018Privilege Log
Date: August 10, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 10, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: August 16, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: November 02, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 02, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: November 05, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 08, 2018Request for Production
Date: November 30, 2018Motion to Compel/Impose Sanctions
Date: January 10, 2019Order on Motion to Compel
Date: January 28, 2019Order Setting
Date: February 20, 2019Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: February 23, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: February 23, 2019Request for Examination
Date: May 14, 2019Expert Witness List
Date: June 03, 2019Witness List
Date: June 03, 2019Motion for Approval
Date: September 23, 2019Motion for Approval
Date: August 16, 2019Order Appt Guardian Ad Litem
Date: September 13, 2019Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem
Date: September 11, 2019Request for Production
Date: January 12, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: September 23, 2019Request for Production
Date: January 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 01, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 16, 2018Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: April 20, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: May 16, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: July 26, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: August 07, 2018Privilege Log
Date: August 07, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: August 07, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: September 13, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: September 18, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 07, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: November 30, 2018Notice of Compliance
Date: November 30, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: December 11, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: December 20, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 04, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: January 11, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 29, 2019Exhibit List
Date: June 03, 2019Notice of Change of Address
Date: June 07, 2019Certificate
Date: June 10, 2019Mediation Report
Date: June 25, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: August 16, 2019Report of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: September 20, 2019Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: January 11, 2019Request for Examination
Date: May 14, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Approval Party: Plaintiff Liotta, Michelle |
|
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Report of Guardian Ad Litem | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Appt Guardian Ad Litem Eric M. Ellsley, Esq |
|
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem Party: Plaintiff Liotta, Michelle |
|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Approval of minor settlement |
|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Wednesday, September 11, 2019 at 8:45 A.M |
|
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF AUTHORITY FOR ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATIONParty: Defendant RB Knot Inc Defendant Arregui, Antero Defendant Arbuthnot, Michael J |
|
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF AUTHORITY FOR ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATIONParty: Defendant Arregui, Antero Defendant Arbuthnot, Michael J Defendant RB Knot Inc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.