Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Broward County, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Teitler, Robert Lon, against Bank Of America Na, Cypress Creek Villas Of Coral Springs Condo Assn Inc, represented by Joseph, Jason Fitzgerald, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Broward County, a political subdivision of the State of Florida, against Bank of America, NA and Cypress Creek Villas of Coral Springs Condominium Association Inc. The complaint is for interpleader and involves a sum of mon...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 12, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 05, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 07, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 02, 2018Certificate of the Clerk
Date: March 14, 2018Order Disbursing Funds
Date: December 11, 2018Motion for Disbursement
Date: January 24, 2020eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 12, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 05, 2018Motion
Date: February 12, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: February 14, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: February 28, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 02, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: August 06, 2018Answer to Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 10, 2018Motion
Date: October 22, 2018Affidavit
Date: November 01, 2018Affidavit
Date: October 29, 2018Disclaimer
Date: November 16, 2018Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: November 21, 2019Affidavit of Time Expended
Date: January 21, 2020Case Management Conference Order
Date: January 22, 2020Order
Date: January 22, 2020Affidavit of Indebtedness
Date: January 22, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: February 03, 2020Answer
Date: January 19, 2018Notice of Deposit
Date: March 14, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Disbursement Party: Defendant Cypress Creek Villas of Coral Springs Condo Assn Inc |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Order SETTING MANDATORY CMC ON 2/21/2020 @ 10:30 AM RM 16165 |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order ON RECORD ACTIVITY OF LOP/CANCELLED |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Indebtedness | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Time Expended | |
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Check Paid TO BROWARD COUNTY PER ORD ($2,200) MAILED TO ATTY |
|
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Disbursing Funds ORDER ON BROWARD COUNTY'S MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES ASSOCIATED WITH THE FILING OF INTERPLEDER ACTION |
|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Disclaimer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.