Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-3, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Salomone, Kenneth Louis, against Londono, Pablo A, represented by Serra, Steven R, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2006-3 against the defendant, PABLO A LONDONO. The plaintiff is seeking damages in the amount of $20,119.53, excluding court costs and interest. The defendant is a resident of Broward ...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 12, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 23, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 05, 2018Affidavit in Opposition
Date: May 01, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 17, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: June 04, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 22, 2018Motion for Rehearing
Date: September 07, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 11, 2018Notice of Withdrawal
Date: September 20, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 12, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 28, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 05, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 10, 2018Notice of Change of Address
Date: October 18, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Party: Plaintiff National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-3 |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal | |
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Rehearing Party: Defendant Londono, Pablo A |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 8/28/18 9:30am |
|
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit in Opposition | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Londono, Pablo A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.