Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ambrocio, Nidia E, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Broward County, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Nidia E. Ambrocio against Broward County, a political subdivision of the State of Florida. The complaint is seeking damages in excess of $15,000. Nidia E. Ambrocio alleges that she was a passenger on a Broward County bus on...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: February 06, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 12, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 12, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: March 19, 2018eSummons Issuance - Alias
Date: March 22, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: JOSE A NEGRONI ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A045798; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance - Alias Party: Defendant Broward County |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Party: Defendant Broward County |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance BROWARD COUNTY |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance BROWARD COUNTY (Florida dept of Financial Services) |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) FOR DAMAGES PURSUANT TO F.S. 768-28Party: Plaintiff Ambrocio, Nidia E |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: JOSE A NEGRONI ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A006006; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: JOSE A NEGRONI ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A006006; ;Amount: $401.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.