Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Jp Morgan Chase Bank National Assn, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Knopp, Eric, Esq., against Deniro, Anthony P, Morris, Jeffrey W, Rose, Katharine, Vann, Basil, represented by Louie, Kenneth J, Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore =/>$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a verified complaint to foreclose a mortgage. The plaintiff, JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, is suing the defendants, including all unknown heirs, creditors, devisees, beneficiaries, grantees, assignees, lienors, trustees...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: January 12, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 12, 2018Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: January 12, 2018Response
Date: January 29, 2018Value Claim Form
Date: January 12, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: February 15, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 31, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 27, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 19, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: February 28, 2018Report of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: May 17, 2018Sworn Statement for Constructive Service of Process
Date: March 09, 2018Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem
Date: March 07, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 24, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 05, 2018Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Administrator
Date: April 18, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 28, 2018Motion for Summary Final Judgment
Date: June 19, 2018Affidavit of Costs
Date: June 19, 2018Motion for Default
Date: June 19, 2018Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: June 19, 2018Order of Default
Date: July 31, 2018Order Setting
Date: July 31, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 12, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: January 31, 2018Affidavit of Diligent Search
Date: February 14, 2018Proof of Publication
Date: April 02, 2018Notice of Action
Date: March 16, 2018Affidavit of Service
Date: June 19, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: June 19, 2018Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic
Date: June 19, 2018Affidavit of Attorney's Time
Date: June 19, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: July 09, 2018Order Setting
Date: July 31, 2018Final Disposition Form
Date: August 03, 2018Affidavit of Attorney Fees
Date: June 19, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Default JUDICIAL |
|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting NJ TRIAL |
|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting NON-JURY FORECLOSURE TRIAL AND PRETRIAL PROCEDURES; 01/09/19 @ 9:00 AM, ROOM 4150 |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Final Judgment Party: Plaintiff JP Morgan Chase Bank National Assn |
|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Costs | |
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default JUD1CIALParty: Plaintiff JP Morgan Chase Bank National Assn |
|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit AFFIDAVIT AS TO AMOUNTS DUE AND OWINGParty: Plaintiff JP Morgan Chase Bank National Assn |
|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service 23rd day of January, 2018Party: Defendant Deniro, Anthony P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.