Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company, filed a(n) Declaratory Judgment case represented by O'Connell, Robert Edward, against Garcia, Sergio B, Ledoux, Christopher M, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with McCarthy, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryDeclaratory Judgment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company against Christopher M. Ledoux and Sergio B. Garcia. The complaint seeks declaratory judgment and relief under Chapter 86 of the Florida Statutes. Ocean Harbor is a Florida insurance c...
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 16, 2018Request to Produce
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: January 16, 2018Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: February 01, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: June 20, 2018Motion for Default & Default
Date: June 20, 2018Good Faith Form
Date: September 17, 2018Motion to Tax Costs
Date: September 20, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: September 20, 2018Good Faith Form
Date: October 22, 2018Order
Date: July 30, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 16, 2018Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 16, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: February 23, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: February 23, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: March 07, 2018Motion for Default & Default
Date: May 22, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: May 22, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: March 08, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: March 08, 2018Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: June 20, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: March 16, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 20, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: June 20, 2018Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: June 20, 2018Notice of Filing Deposition
Date: June 20, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: June 20, 2018Notice of Filing Deposition
Date: June 20, 2018Order
Date: September 17, 2018Affidavit
Date: September 20, 2018Affidavit of Costs
Date: September 20, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order on joint mot to continue trial |
|
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Good Faith Form MOTION TO TAX COSTS |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Tax Costs TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF PREMIUM REFUND AND FOR ENTRY OF A FINAL JUDGMENTParty: Plaintiff Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit OF JOSEPH CELLI |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Costs | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Good Faith Form | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served March 24.2018Party: Defendant Garcia, Sergio B |
|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion for Default & Default |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.