Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-3, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Salomone, Kenneth Louis, against Meneses, Dimas J, Soares , Licett, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2007-3 against defendants LICETT SOARES and DIMAS J MENESES. The plaintiff is seeking damages in the amount of $27,574.49, excluding court costs and interest. The defendants are reside...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 12, 2018eSummons Not Issued - Atty advised
Date: January 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 12, 2018eSummons Issuance (No Fee)
Date: January 17, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 12, 2018Letter/Answer
Date: February 26, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: March 05, 2018Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: January 17, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 23rd day of February 2018Party: Defendant Meneses, Dimas J |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter/Answer Party: Defendant Soares , Licett |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 5th day of February, 2018Party: Defendant Soares , Licett |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance (No Fee) LICETT SOARES |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-3 |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Not Issued - Atty advised One summons per deft |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Dimas J Meneses |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: KENNETH LOUIS SALOMONE ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A005817; ;Amount: $401.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.