Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-1, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Salomone, Kenneth Louis, against Balog, Christine, Balog, Jean, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with McCarthy, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by the plaintiff, National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-1, against the defendants, Christine Balog and Jean Balog. The plaintiff is seeking damages in the amount of $21,630.28, excluding court costs and interest. The def...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 12, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 12, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 29, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Response
Date: February 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Notice of Hearing By Judge
Date: August 21, 2018Good Faith Form
Date: October 23, 2018Comment:
Date: October 23, 2018Notice of Firm Name Change
Date: October 24, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Firm Name Change Party: Attorney Salomone, Kenneth Louis |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Good Faith Form MOTION TO SUMMARY JGMT |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Comment: FORM 1.977. FACT INFORMATION SHEET |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing By Judge October 23, 2018 @ 8:45 AM |
|
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Party: Plaintiff National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-1 |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response Party: Defendant Balog, Jean |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/24/18Party: Defendant Balog, Jean |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint (eFiled) | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Christine Balog |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.