Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
1 Global Capital Llc, Rapid Financial Services, Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Feldman, Jonathan, Esq., against Bruton, Michael, Msb Trading Company Inc, represented by Schorr, Stepehn Arthur, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 12, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 12, 2018eSummons Issuance - Alias
Date: March 06, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Order
Date: February 22, 2019Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: December 03, 2018eSummons Issuance - Alias
Date: February 25, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: January 16, 2019Summons Returned Served
Date: April 22, 2019Alias Summons Returned Served
Date: April 22, 2019Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: January 14, 2020Motion for Default & Default
Date: February 11, 2020Non-Military Affidavit
Date: June 10, 2020Affidavit of Costs
Date: June 10, 2020Affidavit of Reasonable Attorney Fees
Date: July 08, 2020Affidavit of Indebtedness
Date: July 08, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: August 04, 2020Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 12, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 10, 2021Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 29, 2021Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: May 21, 2021Order Denying Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 03, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Affidavit of Lost Summons
Date: March 04, 2019Notice
Date: March 15, 2019Order on Showing of Good Cause
Date: February 21, 2020Motion for Default Final Judgment
Date: June 10, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: January 04, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: January 04, 2021Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: February 05, 2021Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: February 08, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: February 18, 2021Order - Case Management Hearing
Date: February 19, 2021Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: February 19, 2021Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Date: March 17, 2021Order Granting Motion
Date: March 29, 2021Stipulation
Date: June 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation FOR ORDER OF DISMISSALParty: Plaintiff Rapid Financial Services, LLC |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Denying Motion to Dismiss | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Motion to Dismiss | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion for Admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael James EnroughtyParty: Plaintiff Rapid Financial Services, LLC |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss AS TO DEFENDANT. MICHAEL BRUTON AND FOR ENIARGEMENT OF TIME AS TO DEFENDANT MSB TRADING COMPANY INCParty: Defendant MSB Trading Company Inc |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order - Case Management Hearing Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is deemed filed |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference On 04-19-2021 at 9:00 AM room 16170 or Zoom |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint Party: Plaintiff 1 Global Capital LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.