Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Potra, Elena, filed a(n) Temporary / Permanent Injunction case represented by Pro Se, against Cotton, Thomas A, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryTemporary / Permanent Injunction |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed in the Circuit Court of the 17th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The petitioner, Elena Potra, is a tenant, and the defendant, Thomas A. Cotton, is the landlord. The petitioner claims that the notice to move out gi...
Emergency
Date: January 12, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 24, 2018Order
Date: February 21, 2018Civil Application Indigent Status
Date: January 12, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 12, 2018Order
Date: January 17, 2018Reassignment to Hear Emergency Motion(S)
Date: January 17, 2018Letter From
Date: January 30, 2018Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: January 17, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order THIS COURT hereby notices the filing of correspondence received February 21, 2018, a copy ofwhich isattached hereto |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Comment: noh placed in judges box |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter From Party: Defendant Cotton, Thomas A |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/22/18 @ 10:00 AM |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order IN RE: ASSIGNMENT OF ALTERNATE JUDGE FOR EMERGENCY HEARING |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Reassignment to Hear Emergency Motion(S) | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Comment: Emergency Petition Put In Case Mgmt Box |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Emergency Demand for Petition injunctionParty: Plaintiff Potra, Elena |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Application Indigent Status IndigentParty: Plaintiff Potra, Elena |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.