Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Batista, Noemi Marilin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Tison, Devin P, Tison, Devin Paul, against Weiselberg, Dylan Ethan, represented by Strub, Theresa, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Noemi Marilin Batista against Dylan Ethan Weiselberg in the Circuit Court for the 17th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of Dylan Ethan Weiselberg, who rear-ended Noem...
Request to Produce
Date: February 05, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 05, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 01, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: June 14, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 07, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: October 22, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: October 29, 2018Agreed Order
Date: March 05, 2019Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories
Date: June 22, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 12, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: January 22, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: February 05, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 05, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 05, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: February 07, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: February 15, 2018Request for Copies
Date: March 13, 2018Notice of Service
Date: March 13, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 23, 2018Request for Copies
Date: July 03, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: October 04, 2018Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: October 12, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: October 12, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: November 07, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: February 11, 2019Order Setting
Date: February 25, 2019Order On Case Management Conference
Date: February 25, 2019Request for Examination
Date: March 01, 2019Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: March 04, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: March 04, 2019Notice of Service
Date: March 27, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: June 18, 2019Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: June 22, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: June 28, 2019Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: June 29, 2019Notice of Service
Date: July 01, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: July 12, 2019Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: July 24, 2019Supplemental Disclosure of Expert Witness List
Date: July 17, 2019Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: August 01, 2019Acceptance
Date: August 10, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 05, 2018Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: February 05, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: March 08, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: June 26, 2018Notice
Date: March 01, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Acceptance OF PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENTParty: Defendant Weiselberg, Dylan Ethan |
|
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Supplemental Request to Produce | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Supplemental Disclosure of Expert Witness List | |
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
June 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Disclosure of Expert Witness | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
June 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories Party: Defendant Weiselberg, Dylan Ethan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.