Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Eagle Insulation Distributors Supply Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Tam, Daniel, Esq., against Areli Properties Llc, Daniels, Willie, Joseph, Ricky, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Eagle Insulation Distributors Supply, Inc. against Willie Daniels in the Circuit Court of the Seventeenth Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The plaintiff is seeking damages exceeding $15,000, exclusive of court c...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 12, 2018Memo
Date: July 12, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 15, 2018Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: November 08, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: January 27, 2020Order
Date: January 27, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: April 24, 2020Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 12, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: March 07, 2018eSummons Issuance - On Amended
Date: March 08, 2018Reply
Date: April 06, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 01, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 23, 2018Memo
Date: November 07, 2018Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: September 16, 2019Statement of Good Cause
Date: November 08, 2019Order
Date: November 22, 2019Directions to the Clerk
Date: March 27, 2020Request to Produce
Date: April 29, 2020Interrogatories
Date: April 29, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Request to Produce | |
April 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Interrogatories | |
April 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance ON BEHALF OF JUDGMENT CREDITOR(S)Party: Plaintiff Eagle Insulation Distributors Supply Inc |
|
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Directions to the Clerk | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 03-31-2020 9:00 AM; ROOM 16170 |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order ON PLTF'S MOT FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFT, WILLIE DANIELS |
|
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Notice of Lack of Prosecution |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Party: Plaintiff Eagle Insulation Distributors Supply Inc |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Statement of Good Cause Plaintiff |
|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.