Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Tyson, George, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Lazega, Russel, against American Heritage Life Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by George Tyson against American Heritage Life Insurance Company for breach of contract. The complaint states that the plaintiff was insured by the defendant through his employer, The City of Oakland Park, for accident insuran...
Request to Produce
Date: January 28, 2019Agreed Motion
Date: January 10, 2020eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 12, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 12, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: February 01, 2018Notice of Service
Date: January 16, 2018Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Date: March 21, 2018Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Date: March 21, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: June 01, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: July 30, 2018Notice of Service
Date: September 26, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: October 02, 2018Request to Produce
Date: October 02, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 03, 2018Agreed Order Granting
Date: November 05, 2018Motion for Mediation
Date: November 29, 2018Notice to Set Case for Trial
Date: July 15, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: January 28, 2019Request for Copies
Date: July 16, 2019Order Setting
Date: October 03, 2019Agreed Motion
Date: December 02, 2019Joint Stipulation
Date: October 23, 2019Agreed Order
Date: December 02, 2019Exhibits
Date: December 02, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Agreed Motion OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICEParty: Defendant American Heritage Life Insurance Company |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Agreed Motion FOR CONTINUANCE OF THE UNIFORM TRIAL ORDER DEADLINESParty: Plaintiff Tyson, George Defendant American Heritage Life Insurance Company |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order AGREED AMENDED UNIFORM TRIAL ORDER |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Exhibits | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation DESIGNATING MEDIATOR |
|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Setting | |
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice to Set Case for Trial Party: Defendant American Heritage Life Insurance Company |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Request to Produce | |
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.