Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Broward County, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Teitler, Robert Lon, against Coral Springs Tower Club Condominium Association Inc, Machado, Agnes M, Machado, Marcus V, New Century Mortgage, North Broward Hospital District, (total of 5) See All represented by Brennan, Daniel M., Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a civil action for interpleader filed by Broward County, a political subdivision of the State of Florida, against several defendants including New Century Mortgage, Coral Springs Tower Club Condominium Association, Inc., North Browa...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 12, 2018Answer
Date: January 25, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 05, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 05, 2018Motion for Default & Default
Date: February 09, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: March 05, 2018Motion
Date: March 02, 2018Motion
Date: March 21, 2018Response to Motion
Date: May 18, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: March 28, 2018Certificate of the Clerk
Date: March 28, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 12, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: January 29, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 05, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 05, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 13, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: February 26, 2018Order
Date: March 06, 2018Notice of Deposit
Date: March 28, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: August 06, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: February 05, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 05-28-2019 8:45 AM |
|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Check Paid TO TUCKER & LOKEINSKY PA TRUST ACCOUNT PER ORD ($35,389.07) MAILED |
|
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Motion Party: Defendant Machado, Agnes M Defendant Machado, Marcus V |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of the Clerk Party: Plaintiff Broward County |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Deposit Party: Plaintiff Broward County |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Registry/Court Order Payor: BROWARD COUNTY ; Userid: CTS-kwhite ; Receipt: 20181YE1N000286; omments: ORDER DATED 3/5/18 ;Amount: $35,389.07 |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Registry Clerk's Fee Payor: BROWARD COUNTY ; Userid: CTS-kwhite ; Receipt: 20181YE1N000286; omments: ORDER DATED 3/5/18 ;Amount: $547.50 |
|
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR FINAL ORDER OF DISBURSEMENT OF TAX DEED SURPLUSParty: Defendant Coral Springs Tower Club Condominium Association Inc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.