Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Acle, Rebeca, Perez, Omar, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Low, David, Esq., Pujol, Eduardo Alejandro, against Omega Insurance Co, represented by Wallen, Todd L., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by the plaintiffs, Omar Perez and Rebeca Acle, against the defendant, Omega Insurance Company. The plaintiffs are seeking damages exceeding $15,000, exclusive of interest, costs, and attorney's fees. The plaintiffs are residen...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 12, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 12, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 12, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 12, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 09, 2018Notice of Service
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 08, 2018Agreed Order
Date: February 16, 2018Agreed Order
Date: February 16, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 09, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: March 12, 2018Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: March 12, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 12, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 21, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: March 30, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: March 26, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 01, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: May 21, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: June 08, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: August 07, 2018Notice
Date: September 28, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: June 08, 2018Response
Date: June 15, 2018Notice
Date: November 16, 2018Notice of Settlement
Date: June 05, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: May 29, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 12, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 08, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: February 16, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: March 12, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: March 12, 2018Certificate
Date: August 07, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: August 29, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: April 16, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 28, 2019Order
Date: May 15, 2019Stipulation
Date: October 11, 2019Order Granting Attorney Fees
Date: October 11, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 12, 2018Certificate
Date: August 06, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 16, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: June 08, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Granting Attorney Fees | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Defendant Omega Insurance Co |
|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Perez, Omar Plaintiff Acle, Rebeca |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order on pltf's mtn to set trial granted |
|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Video Deposition Defendant's Designated Corporate Representative |
|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice CASE IS AT ISSUEParty: Plaintiff Perez, Omar Plaintiff Acle, Rebeca |
|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice CASE IS AT ISSUEParty: Plaintiff Acle, Rebeca Plaintiff Perez, Omar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.