Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Broward County, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Teitler, Robert Lon, against A-1 Coast Mortgage Company, Mayra, Jose, Palisades Collection Llc, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a civil action for interpleader filed by Broward County, a political subdivision of the State of Florida, against multiple defendants. The complaint states that Broward County has a statutory duty to collect real estate taxes and th...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 29, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 16, 2018Certificate of the Clerk
Date: March 15, 2018Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: June 17, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: January 28, 2020Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: March 17, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 08, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 09, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 09, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 05, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 16, 2018Motion
Date: February 21, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: February 22, 2018Notice of Deposit
Date: March 15, 2018Motion
Date: March 19, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: August 06, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: June 01, 2020Notice of Filing
Date: May 24, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 29, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: February 26, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 29, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: March 21, 2018Order Disbursing Funds
Date: May 29, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 04-14-2021 10:30 AM |
|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 04-03-2020 9:00 AM; ROOM 16175 |
|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Check Paid TO STRALEY OTTO TRUST ACCOUNT PER ORD ($22,031.19) MAILED |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Disbursing Funds ORDER DISBURSING SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF FORECLOSURE SALE/MOTION IS GRANTED |
|
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing The attached DEFENDANT MAYRA JOSE'S MOTION FOR ORDER DISBURSING SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF TAX DEED SALE, ith the Court in this caseParty: Defendant Mayra, Jose |
|
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR ORDER DISBURSING SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF TAX DEED SALE/Defendant Mayra Jose |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.