Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Minto, Kamala, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Ramirez, Manuel A, Esq., against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, represented by Rudman, Aron R, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Kamala Minto against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation. The plaintiff alleges that there was a homeowners insurance policy in effect, and the property located at 5710 Arthur St, Hollywood, FL 33021 sustained a covered...
Notice of Compliance
Date: May 23, 2018Request
Date: June 04, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 15, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: July 20, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 08, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 08, 2018Request for Production of Documents
Date: January 08, 2018Interrogatories
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 08, 2018Answer & Demand for Jury Trial
Date: March 26, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 30, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 30, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: March 30, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 12, 2018Request for Production
Date: May 23, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 23, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: May 23, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: June 29, 2018Request
Date: June 06, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: July 13, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 20, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 16, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Request | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Request | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Compliance WITH FLA. R. JUD. ADMIN. 2.516Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production TO PLAINTIFFParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.