Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Malinchak, Sherry, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Richison, Robin Ann, against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, represented by Rosenblatt, Miriam J, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a legal case filed by Sherry Malinchak against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation. The case number is CACE-18-000525 in the 17th Judicial Circuit Court in Broward County, Florida. The complaint seeks declaratory relief, the app...
Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 22, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: April 27, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: June 12, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 08, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 26, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 02, 2018Agreed Order
Date: January 30, 2018Motion for Entry
Date: April 24, 2018Request for Production
Date: April 27, 2018Response to Motion
Date: May 01, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: June 04, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: June 25, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: June 25, 2018Order Denying Motion
Date: May 02, 2018Agreed Order
Date: June 15, 2018Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 15, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum Justin Malinchak. October 18,2018 @ 10:00am |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Compel IN PART, DEPOSITION OF THE PLAINTIFF |
|
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Time TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY |
|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ENTRY ON LANDParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.