Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bello, Eliceo Ricardo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Serralta, Mario, against Brasher, David Linwood, Hickling, Thomas Edward, represented by Silverman, Lisa Beth, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Request for Production
Date: January 08, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 08, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 08, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 08, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 31, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 23, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: March 23, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 23, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: March 30, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: April 03, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 03, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 03, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 17, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: August 31, 2018Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: September 04, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: September 05, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: September 20, 2018Re-Notice of Mediation
Date: September 24, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: October 16, 2018Ex Parte Order to Compel
Date: November 05, 2018Re-Notice of Mediation
Date: December 12, 2018Re-Notice of Mediation
Date: December 12, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 13, 2019Mediation Report
Date: March 13, 2019Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: March 26, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: May 13, 2019Response to Request to Produce
Date: May 16, 2019Request for Compulsory Physical Examination
Date: June 10, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: November 18, 2019Motion for Mediation
Date: January 06, 2020Notice of Mediation
Date: January 23, 2020Notice of Disclosing Expert
Date: January 24, 2020Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: January 27, 2020Request for Production
Date: February 07, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: March 16, 2020Request for Production
Date: February 19, 2020Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: March 17, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: March 30, 2020Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 30, 2020Response to Request to Produce
Date: March 30, 2020Motion for Sanctions
Date: April 02, 2020Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 03, 2020Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation
Date: April 06, 2020Motion to Withdraw
Date: April 13, 2020Motion for Sanctions
Date: April 13, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: April 17, 2020Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 13, 2020Exhibits
Date: May 01, 2020Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 27, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 23, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: June 14, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: November 06, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: April 03, 2020Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 31, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 23, 2018Motion for Sanctions
Date: April 13, 2020Motion for Mediation
Date: January 06, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: March 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibits STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
May 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Directions to the Clerk FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL was filed |
|
April 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Bello, Eliceo Ricardo |
|
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw Party: Plaintiff Bello, Eliceo Ricardo |
|
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Sanctions Party: Defendant Hickling, Thomas Edward Defendant Brasher, David Linwood |
|
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation of deposition scheduled for April 13/2020 10:30amParty: Defendant Hickling, Thomas Edward Defendant Brasher, David Linwood |
|
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting TRIAL; Calendar Call will be 06-22-2020 10:00 AM |
|
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Sanctions Party: Defendant Brasher, David Linwood Defendant Hickling, Thomas Edward |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.