Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Force, Steven L, Esq., against Jesus, Estela M, Jesus, Manuel, Miranda, Alexander, Perez, Rose M, Shenandoah Community Assn Inc, (total of 7) See All represented by Dunn, Mark S, Esteras, Awilda, Levine, Scott J, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore =/>$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as trustee, on behalf of the holders of the Impac Secured Assets Corp. Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-1 against Manuel Jesus and other defendants. T...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Affidavit of Constructive Service of Process
Date: February 28, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: April 02, 2018Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic
Date: April 16, 2018Order of Default
Date: July 17, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: August 31, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: February 20, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: February 22, 2019Case Management Conference Order
Date: April 09, 2019Order
Date: May 29, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: July 29, 2019Motion for Default
Date: September 11, 2019Affidavit
Date: September 11, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: September 25, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: September 25, 2019Notice
Date: September 26, 2019Notice
Date: November 21, 2019Agreed Order Granting
Date: December 17, 2019Amended Witness List
Date: January 24, 2020Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: December 21, 2020Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: April 15, 2021Certificate of Sale
Date: May 19, 2021Letter Returned From Post Office
Date: June 11, 2021Letter Returned From Post Office
Date: October 01, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 22, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 22, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 22, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 22, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 22, 2018Affidavit of Diligent Search
Date: February 28, 2018Directions to the Clerk
Date: February 28, 2018Certificate of Mailing
Date: March 13, 2018Notice of Action
Date: March 13, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: April 16, 2018Motion for Default & Default
Date: April 16, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 26, 2018Order Setting
Date: July 17, 2018Notice of Service
Date: July 19, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: January 14, 2019Motion to Amend Complaint
Date: January 14, 2019Answer
Date: January 16, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: January 28, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: February 08, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: February 20, 2019Order On Motion to Strike
Date: February 20, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: April 09, 2019Notice of Service
Date: May 30, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: July 29, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: July 30, 2019Notice
Date: September 26, 2019Witness & Exhibit List
Date: October 02, 2019Notice
Date: October 02, 2019Order Setting
Date: November 19, 2019Motion for Substitution of Counsel
Date: December 13, 2019Agreed Order Granting
Date: December 17, 2019Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: February 20, 2020Exhibit List
Date: February 27, 2020Exhibits
Date: February 27, 2020Proof of Publication
Date: March 05, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: September 22, 2020Motion to Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: March 12, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: March 17, 2021Ord Setting/Resetting Foreclosure Sale
Date: April 13, 2021Proof of Publication
Date: April 29, 2021Certificate of Disbursements
Date: June 02, 2021Certificate of Title
Date: June 02, 2021Letter Returned From Post Office
Date: October 01, 2021Letter Returned From Post Office
Date: October 01, 2021Letter Returned From Post Office
Date: October 01, 2021Letter Returned From Post Office
Date: October 01, 2021Bid Sheet
Date: May 19, 2021Value Claim Form
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Lis Pendens
Date: January 08, 2018Answer
Date: January 30, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 22, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 22, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 22, 2018Affidavit
Date: February 28, 2018Answer
Date: April 02, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 22, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 22, 2018Proof of Publication
Date: March 28, 2018Motion for Default
Date: April 25, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: April 25, 2018Order Setting
Date: August 03, 2018Witness & Exhibit List
Date: August 22, 2018Motion
Date: February 13, 2019Motion to Strike
Date: February 01, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: February 20, 2019Notice of Service
Date: February 22, 2019Motion for More Definite Statement
Date: March 21, 2019Summons Returned Served
Date: February 28, 2019Notice of Service
Date: April 12, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: May 28, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: May 28, 2019Notice of Change of Address
Date: August 15, 2019Order of Default
Date: September 25, 2019Motion to be Excused
Date: December 13, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: January 27, 2020Certificate of Service
Date: January 07, 2020Final Disposition Form
Date: February 18, 2020Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 08, 2018Answer
Date: January 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Returned From Post Office UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROSE M PEREZ |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Returned From Post Office UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ALEXANDER M MIRANDA |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Returned From Post Office ROSE PEREZ |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Returned From Post Office UNKNOWN TENANT |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Returned From Post Office ROSE M PEREZ |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter Returned From Post Office | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title & Certificate of Disbursement Emailed | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title & Certificate of Disbursement Mailed | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.