Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Broward County, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Teitler, Robert Lon, against Estate Of Iris M Ruiz, Palm Springs Ii Condominium Association Inc, Syb Properties Llc, represented by Frydman, Robin F, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Broward County, a political subdivision of the State of Florida, against Palm Springs II Condominium Association, Inc., SYB Properties LLC, and the Estate of Iris M. Ruiz (deceased). The complaint is for interpleader and in...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 08, 2018Motion
Date: January 31, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: September 04, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 07, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: February 26, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 01, 2018Order
Date: February 05, 2018Motion for Final Judgment
Date: August 22, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: August 06, 2018Affidavit in Support
Date: September 11, 2018Motion
Date: September 10, 2018Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: September 06, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 08, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 29, 2018Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: September 14, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Check Paid to THE FRYDMAN LAW GROUP PLLC IOLTA ACCOUNT per ord ($6,710.20); BROWARD COUNTY OFFICE OF THE COUNT ATTY ($2,200.00) mailed |
|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Hearing | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Support OF REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES |
|
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES ASSOCIATED WITH THE FILING OF INTERPLEADER ACTIONParty: Plaintiff Broward County |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Affidavit | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Final Judgment Party: Defendant Palm Springs II Condominium Association Inc |
|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Registry Clerk's Fee Payor: BROWARD COUNTY ; Userid: CTS-kwhite ; Receipt: 20181YE1N000251; omments: ORDER DATED 2/5/18 ;Amount: $427.50 |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Registry/Court Order Payor: BROWARD COUNTY ; Userid: CTS-kwhite ; Receipt: 20181YE1N000251; omments: ORDER DATED 2/5/18 ;Amount: $27,524.78 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.