Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Smith, Peter, Smith, Susan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Thompson, Russell Miller, against Kay, Mathew Dean, Kay, Rebecca Jolie, represented by Gordon, Jeffrey Frank, Murphy, John, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Fahnestock, Fabienne E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Susan Smith and Peter Smith against Rebecca Jolie Kay and Mathew Dean Kay. The plaintiffs are seeking damages in excess of $15,000. The incident in question occurred on March 24, 2017, when Rebecca Jolie Kay negligently ope...
Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: February 07, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 08, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 08, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 08, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 05, 2018Request for Production
Date: February 05, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 05, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 23, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 05, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 23, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: March 02, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 10, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 19, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: April 19, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: April 10, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: August 23, 2018Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: May 14, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 14, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 14, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: May 30, 2018Answer to Supplemental Interrogatories
Date: August 02, 2018Order on Motion to Compel
Date: June 27, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: August 01, 2018Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: September 07, 2018Request for Medical Examination
Date: October 26, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: September 10, 2018Objection
Date: October 28, 2018Stipulation & Order
Date: December 19, 2018Stipulation
Date: December 10, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 13, 2019Request for Medical Examination
Date: April 05, 2019Objection
Date: April 10, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: July 15, 2019Motion to be Excused
Date: July 16, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: July 17, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 18, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 19, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 22, 2019Notice of Withdrawal
Date: July 25, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 26, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 12, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: August 09, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: August 12, 2019Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories
Date: August 14, 2019Witness & Exhibit List
Date: August 13, 2019Notice of Compliance
Date: September 26, 2019Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: August 14, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: August 16, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: September 12, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 12, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 19, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: September 27, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: October 01, 2019Expert Interrogatories
Date: October 11, 2019Notice of Conflict
Date: November 18, 2019Exhibits
Date: January 22, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 05, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: February 09, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 01, 2018Agreed Order
Date: March 08, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: March 23, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 26, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: March 30, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: April 23, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 26, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 09, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 11, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: May 14, 2018Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: August 02, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: September 06, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: September 24, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: October 26, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 17, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: January 04, 2019Request for Medical Examination
Date: March 01, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 05, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: April 05, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 08, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: June 21, 2019Objection
Date: June 25, 2019Supplemental Interrogatories
Date: June 27, 2019Witness List
Date: July 19, 2019Request for Copies
Date: July 29, 2019Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: July 30, 2019Request to Produce
Date: August 14, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: August 15, 2019Request for Copies
Date: August 16, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: August 29, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: September 16, 2019Request for Copies
Date: September 18, 2019Privilege Log
Date: October 11, 2019Response to Request to Produce
Date: October 11, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: October 14, 2019Witness & Exhibit List
Date: October 28, 2019Notice of Compliance
Date: November 07, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: November 22, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: July 26, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 19, 2019Agreed Order
Date: June 24, 2019Exhibits
Date: June 24, 2019Request for Production
Date: June 27, 2019Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: July 15, 2019Response to Request to Produce
Date: July 22, 2019Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: August 20, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: September 27, 2019Request for Copies
Date: October 01, 2019Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: August 14, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibits STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Smith, Susan Plaintiff Smith, Peter |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Conflict | |
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Compliance WITH PLAINTIFF'S REOUEST FOR COPIESParty: Defendant Kay, Rebecca Jolie |
|
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Witness & Exhibit List | |
October 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
October 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Expert Interrogatories | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Privilege Log | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.