Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bayview Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Deluca, Orlando, against Imagination Farms Community Assn Inc, Pablo, Rey J, Jr., Rey, Alisa, represented by Bujan, Jesus F, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore =/>$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC against Pablo J. Rey, Jr., Alisa Rey, Imagination Farms Community Association, Inc, and unknown tenants. The complaint alleges that on August 27, 2007, Pablo J. Rey, Jr. exec...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 17, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: January 17, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: January 17, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: January 17, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: January 17, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 17, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: February 26, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 23, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: February 26, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 23, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 23, 2018Reply to Answer
Date: January 23, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: January 31, 2018Request to Produce
Date: February 26, 2018Certificate of Service
Date: February 28, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 26, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: March 27, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: March 27, 2018Notice
Date: May 01, 2018Order On Case Management Conference
Date: May 03, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: June 25, 2018Request for Production
Date: May 08, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: August 28, 2018Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale
Date: January 11, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 08, 2018Answer
Date: January 16, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 17, 2018Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 27, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 27, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 27, 2018Notice of Interrogatories
Date: March 27, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 10, 2018Ord Setting Non-Jury Trial
Date: May 03, 2018Ord Setting Non-Jury Trial
Date: May 03, 2018Witness & Exhibit List
Date: May 08, 2018Amended Witness List
Date: May 16, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 25, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: August 22, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: June 25, 2018Notice of Deposit
Date: August 24, 2018Notice
Date: August 28, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 24, 2018Motion for Entry
Date: August 28, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 28, 2018Joint Stipulation
Date: September 06, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: September 06, 2018Certificate of Service
Date: October 25, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: October 17, 2018Final Disposition Form
Date: October 17, 2018Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: December 11, 2018Proof of Publication
Date: December 26, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: January 09, 2019Certificate of Service
Date: January 15, 2019Notice of Action
Date: February 25, 2019Value Claim Form
Date: January 08, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: March 27, 2018Certificate of Service
Date: May 08, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Action 30 days after first publication |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Comment: original note, mortgage and planned unit development rider document return request completed for Delca on 1/24/19. |
|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Party: Plaintiff Bayview Loan Servicing LLC |
|
January 15, 2019 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale SET FOR JANUARY 15,2019, RELEASE ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE, VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT AND VOLUNTARILYDISMISS ACTIONParty: Plaintiff Bayview Loan Servicing LLC |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing January 14,2019 at 8:45am Room 15160 |
|
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication January 15, 2019 |
|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Electronic Sale Fee Paid Payor: DELUCA LAW GROUP ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A166878; ;Amount: $70.00 |
|
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney 15th day of January 2019 |
|
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE CREATED FOR ORIGINAL DOCS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.