Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Murcia, Jaime, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Ratzan, Stuart N, against Rayfield Family Literacy Inc, represented by Friedman, Jason Robert, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryProfessional Malpractice - Medical |
Last RefreshedJanuary 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is brought by Jaime Murcia, individually and as the personal representative of the Estate of Diana Murcia, against Rayfield Family Literacy, Inc. d/b/a Rayfield Literacy Center. The complaint alleges negligence and wrongful death under...
Notice of Video Deposition
Date: August 29, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: April 20, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 08, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: April 10, 2018Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: July 16, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: October 03, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: September 26, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: August 29, 2018Privilege Log
Date: June 05, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: August 02, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: August 29, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 02, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 26, 2018Notice
Date: April 24, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 26, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 07, 2018Request for Production
Date: May 24, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: April 25, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: June 26, 2018Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: May 24, 2018Agreed Order
Date: August 20, 2018Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: May 03, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: August 02, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: August 29, 2018Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: August 29, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 19, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: September 26, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: December 21, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 20, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: December 18, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: December 20, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: December 19, 2018Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: December 05, 2018Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: December 29, 2018Notice of Interrogatories
Date: October 03, 2018Agreed Order
Date: September 11, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 10, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 21, 2018Motion
Date: January 02, 2019Notice of Scriveners Error
Date: December 20, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: December 18, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: December 28, 2018Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: December 26, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: January 04, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: January 09, 2019Notice
Date: December 19, 2018Request
Date: January 10, 2019Request for Production
Date: November 26, 2018Request for Production
Date: December 11, 2018Memorandum in Support
Date: January 15, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: December 10, 2018Motion for Order to Show Cause
Date: January 10, 2019Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: November 19, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: December 04, 2018Agreed Order
Date: December 31, 2018Order
Date: July 09, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 13, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: December 11, 2018Notice
Date: July 16, 2018Expert Witness List
Date: January 07, 2019Certificate
Date: January 10, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 08, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: July 06, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: August 02, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: January 11, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: December 06, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: April 20, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: December 19, 2018Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: January 08, 2019Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: December 31, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: November 19, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 08, 2018Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: August 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: July 06, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: July 26, 2018Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: August 29, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: August 29, 2018Mediation Report
Date: January 15, 2019Notice of Video Deposition
Date: August 29, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: October 03, 2018Request for Production
Date: September 21, 2018Subpoena Filed
Date: October 10, 2018Answer to Interrogs
Date: September 28, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 01, 2018Request for Copies
Date: December 19, 2018Request for Production
Date: October 03, 2018Agreed Order
Date: December 20, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 14, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Memorandum in Support | |
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce | |
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Request | |
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order to Show Cause Party: Defendant Rayfield Family Literacy Inc |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATIONParty: Defendant Rayfield Family Literacy Inc |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Hearing | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Expert Witness List | |
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.