Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Broward County, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Teitler, Robert Lon, against Gonzalez Del Valle, Carlos, Mers, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Fahnestock, Fabienne E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a civil action for interpleader filed by Broward County, a political subdivision of the State of Florida. The complaint states that Broward County has a statutory duty to collect real estate taxes and sold Tax Certificate No. 4787 f...
Summons Returned Served
Date: January 29, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Letter From
Date: February 02, 2018Motion
Date: February 12, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 07, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: February 26, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: October 18, 2018Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: October 18, 2019Order Disbursing Funds
Date: November 27, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 08, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Letter/Answer
Date: February 08, 2018Order to Deposit Funds
Date: February 15, 2018Notice of Deposit
Date: March 15, 2018Certificate of the Clerk
Date: March 15, 2018Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: October 18, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Check Paid to BROWARD COUNTY OFFICE OF COUNTY ATTORNEY per ord ($1,000.00) mailed |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Disbursing Funds | |
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing November 27,2018 at 8:45 a.m |
|
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Attorney Fees ASSOCIATED WITH THE FILING OF INTERPLEADER ACTIONParty: Plaintiff Broward County |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Deposit Party: Plaintiff Broward County |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of the Clerk Party: Plaintiff Broward County |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Registry Clerk's Fee Payor: BROWARD COUNTY ; Userid: CTS-kwhite ; Receipt: 20181YE1N000261; omments: ORDER DATED 2/13/18 ;Amount: $361.50 |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Registry/Court Order Payor: BROWARD COUNTY ; Userid: CTS-kwhite ; Receipt: 20181YE1N000261; omments: ORDER DATED 2/13/18 ;Amount: $23,236.08 |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.