Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lanza, Edward Nicholas, L&V Distributors Inc, Socal Distributors, Llc, filed a(n) Other - Trade Secret case represented by Jenkins, J Spencer, Shutts & Bowen Llp, against Frisone, Vincent, Sr., Lanza, Edward Nicholas, L&V Distributors, Inc, Socal Distributors Llc, represented by Elkins, Jeffrey Scott, Jenkins, J Spencer, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Trade Secret |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Plaintiff L&V Distributors, Inc. against Defendants Socal Distributors, LLC and Edward Nicholas Lanza. The complaint alleges that Lanza, who was previously employed as the Vice President of Sales at L&V, misappropriated tra...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 08, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: May 03, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: April 09, 2018Request for Production
Date: May 03, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: May 11, 2018Motion to Compel/Impose Sanctions
Date: June 26, 2018Notice of Service
Date: September 24, 2018Order Setting
Date: October 08, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: November 12, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: November 19, 2018Witness List
Date: January 07, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: January 14, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 18, 2019Joint Stipulation
Date: January 14, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 17, 2019Agreed Order
Date: January 25, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: February 19, 2019Agreed Order Granting
Date: March 05, 2019Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: April 08, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 07, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 30, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: February 06, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses & Counterclaim
Date: February 26, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: February 27, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 19, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: April 09, 2018Request to Produce
Date: April 09, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 03, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: May 09, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: June 08, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: May 09, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: June 29, 2018Notice of Jury Trial
Date: August 24, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: November 12, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: February 18, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: February 19, 2019Motion for Continuance
Date: April 05, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: April 08, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: April 30, 2019Joint Stipulation
Date: May 03, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: November 12, 2018Joint Stipulation
Date: May 03, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 06, 2018Response to Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 09, 2018Motion to Compel/Impose Sanctions
Date: June 26, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: November 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICEParty: Plaintiff SOCAL DISTRIBUTORS, LLC Plaintiff LANZA, EDWARD NICHOLAS Plaintiff L&V Distributors Inc Defendant Socal Distributors LLC Defendant Lanza, Edward Nicholas Defendant L&V DISTRIBUTORS, INC Defendant FRISONE, VINCENT, Sr. |
|
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICEParty: Plaintiff L&V Distributors Inc Defendant Socal Distributors LLC Defendant Lanza, Edward Nicholas Plaintiff SOCAL DISTRIBUTORS, LLC Plaintiff LANZA, EDWARD NICHOLAS Defendant L&V DISTRIBUTORS, INC Defendant FRISONE, VINCENT, Sr. |
|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Hearing | |
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIALParty: Plaintiff L&V Distributors Inc Defendant FRISONE, VINCENT, Sr. |
|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time | |
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order Granting MOTION TO COMPEL |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.