Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Duran, Juan J, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Lopez, Carolina, against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Ronderos, Ian S, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Juan J. Duran against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The complaint alleges that the insured's property, located at 631 Heritage Drive Weston FL, sustained a covered loss due to water damage on September 14...
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Interrogatories
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 17, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: January 29, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 12, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: May 30, 2018Consent to Substitution of Counsel
Date: July 30, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 08, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Notice
Date: January 08, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 08, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 13, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 31, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 08, 2018Ex Parte Motion
Date: July 11, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: July 30, 2018Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: August 27, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: September 10, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Order for Substitution of Counsel | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Consent to Substitution of Counsel Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel Ian S. Ronderos, Esquire Florida Bar No.: 0070462Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Motion Party: Plaintiff Duran, Juan J |
|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Protective Order DEFENDANT'S |
|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Lazaro C. Rodriguez, Esquire / Florida Bar No.: 0154301Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Lazaro C. Rodriguez, Esquire / Florida Bar No. 0154301Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.