Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Walters, Clement, Walters, Novlett, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Lopez, Anthony M, Esq., Pro Se, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Ronderos, Ian S, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Clement Walters and Novlett Walters against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The complaint alleges that the Insured had a homeowners insurance policy with the Insurance Company, and the Insured's property lo...
Notice of Appearance
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: February 21, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 30, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: July 02, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: July 30, 2018Order On Case Management Conference
Date: November 08, 2019Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: December 31, 2019Expert Witness List
Date: January 22, 2020Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: January 07, 2020Motion for Leave
Date: February 20, 2020Exhibit List
Date: April 24, 2020Notice of Withdrawal
Date: May 06, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: June 10, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: May 14, 2020Directions to the Clerk
Date: June 23, 2020Request for Production of Documents
Date: January 08, 2018Interrogatories
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 30, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 08, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 31, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 08, 2018Consent to Substitution of Counsel
Date: July 30, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: May 02, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: October 29, 2019Request to Produce
Date: December 18, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: December 18, 2019Order Setting
Date: November 08, 2019Notice of Non Objection to Production
Date: December 31, 2019Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: January 02, 2020Notice of Unavailability
Date: December 26, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 07, 2020Stipulation & Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: January 08, 2020Amended Witness List
Date: February 04, 2020Notice of Unavailability
Date: January 28, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: February 20, 2020Witness List
Date: January 07, 2020Consent to Substitution of Counsel
Date: January 07, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: March 11, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 27, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: March 11, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 02, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 09, 2020Order Setting
Date: April 13, 2020Request for Production
Date: April 15, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: April 24, 2020Motion to Withdraw
Date: June 10, 2020Notice of Filing
Date: June 22, 2020Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 22, 2020Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 21, 2020Motion for Sanctions
Date: March 25, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Directions to the Clerk | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw AMENDEDParty: Plaintiff Walters, Clement |
|
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal | |
April 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
April 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.