Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Miles, Brian, Miles, Renee, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Lopez, Anthony M, Esq., against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Rodriguez, Lazaro C, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Brian Miles and Renee Miles against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiffs allege that they had a homeowners insurance policy with the defendant, and their property located at 450 SE 16th Ave, Pompa...
Interrogatories
Date: January 08, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 25, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 18, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 01, 2018Notice
Date: April 11, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: May 06, 2019Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: February 26, 2019Request to Produce
Date: April 04, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: April 04, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: April 11, 2019Request for Production
Date: January 08, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 17, 2018Acceptance of Service By Secretary of State
Date: January 25, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 03, 2018Agreed Order
Date: February 05, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: February 10, 2018Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: February 12, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 20, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: March 01, 2018Agreed Order
Date: April 07, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: April 18, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: April 25, 2018Request for Production
Date: April 25, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO FILE RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUESTSParty: Plaintiff Miles, Brian Plaintiff Miles, Renee |
|
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF GOOD CAUSEParty: Plaintiff Miles, Brian Plaintiff Miles, Renee | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel deposition of defendant's corporate representative and field adjusterParty: Plaintiff Miles, Brian Plaintiff Miles, Renee |
|
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Request to Produce | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.