Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Sahonero, Miren, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Lopez, Carolina, against Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company, represented by Valentine, Rose Y, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with McCarthy, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Miren Sahonero against Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company. The complaint alleges that the insured property, located at 16401 Turquoise Trail, Weston FL, sustained water damage on September 10, 2017. The insurance company ac...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 08, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 12, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 31, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 08, 2018Interrogatories
Date: January 08, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 25, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 25, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 08, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 08, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 31, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: February 01, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: February 28, 2018Privilege Log
Date: February 26, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: February 26, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: April 13, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: April 18, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: April 19, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: February 26, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: February 26, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: April 13, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 08, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Protective Order FOR THE DESPOSITION OF THE INDEPENDENT ADJUSTER AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOFParty: Defendant Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company |
|
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Protective Order FOR THE DEPOSITION OF ITS CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORTParty: Defendant Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Privilege Log | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.