Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lewis, Paulette, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Lopez, Anthony M, Esq., against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Rodriguez, Lazaro C, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Paulette Lewis against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The complaint alleges that Lewis had a homeowners insurance policy with the Insurance Company, and that the property insured under the policy sustained...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 08, 2018Interrogatories
Date: January 08, 2018Agreed Order
Date: February 06, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: April 10, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: May 07, 2019Request for Production of Documents
Date: January 08, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: June 12, 2020eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 12, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 03, 2018Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: February 12, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: May 24, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: December 13, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: February 10, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 20, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: July 09, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: December 14, 2018Notice of Withdrawal
Date: December 13, 2018Privilege Log
Date: May 07, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 07, 2019Request to Produce
Date: May 08, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 08, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 09, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 09, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 05, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 31, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 21, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 07-13-2020 at 8:45 am rm 15175 |
|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Lewis, Paulette |
|
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Request to Produce | |
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
May 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
May 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Privilege Log |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.