Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Laguna Springs Homeowners Association, Inc., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Backer, Keith F, Esq., against Williamson, Anne Lindsay, Zuluaga, Jose H, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Other - $0 - $50,000 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is filed by the Laguna Springs Homeowners Association, Inc. against Jose H. Zuluaga and Anne Lindsay Williamson. The association is seeking to foreclose a claim of lien for assessments on the defendants' property. The association is a ...
Certificate of Service
Date: June 29, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 05, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 22, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 08, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 08, 2018Value Claim Form
Date: January 08, 2018Letter/Answer
Date: February 09, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 08, 2018Order
Date: June 28, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Lis Pendens
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 25, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Party: Plaintiff Laguna Springs Homeowners Association, Inc. |
|
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order ON MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT--RESCHEDULED FOR 07/31/18 8:45 AM |
|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Party: Plaintiff Laguna Springs Homeowners Association, Inc. |
|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Laguna Springs Homeowners Association, Inc. |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter/Answer Party: Defendant Zuluaga, Jose H Defendant Williamson, Anne Lindsay |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 20th day of January, 2018Party: Defendant Williamson, Anne Lindsay |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 20th day of January, 2018Party: Defendant Zuluaga, Jose H |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Anne Lindsay Williamson |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.