Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Mobley, Shawanni, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Dennis, Kevin B, against Speedway Llc, represented by Mccaffrey, Michael K, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryNeg - Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Shawanni Mobley against Speedway LLC, a foreign limited liability company. The complaint alleges personal injury negligence on the part of Speedway LLC. The incident occurred on July 24, 2016, at the property owned and oper...
Request for Admissions
Date: February 19, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: June 08, 2018Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: June 08, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: June 11, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: June 29, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: July 10, 2018Motion to Tax Costs
Date: December 12, 2019Response to Request to Produce
Date: August 08, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: October 30, 2018Motion to Tax Costs
Date: December 11, 2019Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: September 13, 2019Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: November 12, 2020Request for Production
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 08, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 08, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 08, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 22, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 19, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 19, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 19, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 16, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 19, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: March 16, 2018Privilege Log
Date: March 16, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 16, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: March 23, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: May 08, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 08, 2018Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: June 08, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: September 03, 2020Certificate
Date: November 02, 2020Stipulation
Date: December 22, 2020Request for Production of Documents
Date: February 19, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 08, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: March 23, 2018Request to Produce
Date: June 07, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Response - Request for Production Party: Plaintiff Mobley, Shawanni |
|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate NOTICE OF MEDIATION ATTENDANCE AND CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITYParty: Defendant Speedway LLC |
|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Tax Costs Party: Defendant Speedway LLC |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Tax Costs Party: Defendant Speedway LLC |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.