Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Karen Cole Plaintiff vs. Pollo Operations Inc Defendant
On January 08, 2018 a neg - premises liability commercial case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 08, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Neg - Premises Liability Commercial
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
General Commercial
Status
Settlement
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I - PERSONAL INJURY NEGLIGENCE
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Karen Cole against Pollo Operations, Inc., doing business as Fiesta Restaurant Group, Inc., also known as Pollo Tropical. The complaint alleges personal injury negligence. Karen Cole was a resident of Pompano Beach, Bro…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Acceptance of Offer of Judgment
Date: Oct 21, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: Oct 21, 2019Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: Sep 09, 2019Mediation Report
Date: Sep 05, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: Jul 16, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: Jun 19, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Jun 13, 2019Notice of Availability
Date: Jun 13, 2019Interrogatories Notice of Service
Date: Apr 25, 2019Agreed Order
Date: Jan 14, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: Dec 14, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: Dec 07, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Nov 20, 2018Motion
Date: Nov 06, 2018Request to Produce
Date: Oct 31, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: Sep 04, 2018Request for Production
Date: Aug 21, 2018Request for Production
Date: Aug 21, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: Aug 16, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Jul 13, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: Jul 10, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Jun 22, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: Jun 11, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: Jun 06, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: May 26, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 26, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 09, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Apr 26, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Apr 26, 2018Request for Production
Date: Apr 26, 2018Agreed Order
Date: Feb 23, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: Feb 23, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: Feb 14, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Jan 29, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Jan 29, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Jan 29, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Jan 29, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Jan 29, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 08, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jan 08, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 08, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Jan 08, 2018Interrogatories Notice of Filing
Date: Jan 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 08, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Acceptance of Offer of Judgment | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENTParty: Plaintiff Cole, Karen | |
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Availability | |
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Interrogatories & Notice of Service | |
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE, RESTRICT INSPECTION, DISASSEMBLY AND TESTING OF FOOTWEAR |
|
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE; RESTRICT INSPECTION. DISASSEMBLY AND TESTING OF FOOTWEARParty: Defendant Pollo Operations Inc |
|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Produce | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request to Produce Party: Plaintiff Cole, Karen |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production TO PLAINTIFFParty: Defendant Pollo Operations Inc |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production OF DOCUMENTSParty: Defendant Pollo Operations Inc |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel And Answer To InterrogatoriesParty: Defendant Pollo Operations Inc |
|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
May 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
May 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Defendant Pollo Operations Inc |
|
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Defendant Pollo Operations Inc |
|
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Defendant Pollo Operations Inc |
|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME |
|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant Pollo Operations Inc |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 16th day of January, 2018Party: Defendant Pollo Operations Inc |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint (eFiled) | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Pollo Operations IncParty: Plaintiff Cole, Karen |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Pollo Operations IncParty: Plaintiff Cole, Karen |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories & Notice of Filing Pollo Operations IncParty: Plaintiff Cole, Karen |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Pollo Operations Inc |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: KEVIN BRUCE DENNIS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A003135; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: KEVIN BRUCE DENNIS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A003135; ;Amount: $401.00 |