Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Broward County, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Teitler, Robert Lon, against Department Of Treasury: Internal Revenue Services, Gardner, Carol, Singh, Shawn A., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Fahnestock, Fabienne E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a civil action for interpleader filed by Broward County, a political subdivision of the State of Florida, against the Department of Treasury: Internal Revenue Services, Carol Gardner, and Shawn A. Singh. The complaint states that Br...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: February 28, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: March 19, 2018Notice of Deposit
Date: April 25, 2018Certificate of the Clerk
Date: April 25, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: August 06, 2018Motion
Date: October 18, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: October 18, 2018Order Disbursing Funds
Date: November 27, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 08, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 18, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: March 05, 2018Motion
Date: March 16, 2018Order to Deposit Funds
Date: March 20, 2018Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: October 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Check Paid TO BROWARD COUNTY PER ORD ($1,000) MAILED |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Disbursing Funds | |
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES ASSOCIATED WITH THE FILING OF INTERPLEADER ACTIONParty: Plaintiff Broward County |
|
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing November 27, 2018 at 8:45 a.m. ROOM 14170 |
|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Deposit Party: Plaintiff Broward County |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of the Clerk Party: Plaintiff Broward County |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Registry/Court Order Payor: BROWARD COUNTY ; Userid: CTS-rbell ; Receipt: 20181YE1I000212; omments: ORDER DATED 3/19/18 ;Amount: $61,063.53 |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Registry Clerk's Fee Payor: BROWARD COUNTY ; Userid: CTS-rbell ; Receipt: 20181YE1I000212; omments: ORDER DATED 3/19/18 ;Amount: $939.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.