Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Rivera, Miguel A, Rivera, Miguel A., Jr., filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Puchades, Michael Angel, against American Security Insurance Company, represented by Levy, Sara, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by the Plaintiffs, Miguel A Rivera and Miguel A Rivera Jr., against the Defendant, American Security Insurance Company. The Plaintiffs are residents of Broward County, Florida, while the Defendant is an insurance company doing...
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: March 08, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 17, 2018Joint Stipulation
Date: November 28, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 22, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 12, 2018Request for Production
Date: February 12, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 20, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: February 14, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 08, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL >yITH PREJUDICE | |
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant American Security Insurance Company |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Video Deposition Miguel A Rivera Miguel A Rivera Jr |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: MICHAEL A PUCHADES ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A010306; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.