Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Rosen, Ken, Rosen, Sheri, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Singer, David, against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Sweeney, Nora, represented by Danner, Scott E, Wilke, John J, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with McCarthy, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed in the Circuit Court of the 17th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The plaintiff, Sheri Rosen, is suing defendants Nora Sweeney and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for damages exceeding $15,000. The c...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 08, 2018Request to Produce
Date: January 08, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 25, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 08, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 08, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 25, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 02, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 05, 2018Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: March 02, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: March 02, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: March 19, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: March 20, 2018Request for Copies
Date: April 02, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 29, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 08, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 15, 2018Motion to Consolidate
Date: May 17, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: May 21, 2018Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: May 22, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 18, 2018Answer to Interrogs
Date: May 21, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 30, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: June 01, 2018Request for Copies
Date: June 20, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: July 09, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: October 01, 2018Request for Copies
Date: January 28, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 03, 2019Request to Produce
Date: March 16, 2019Motion to Vacate Order
Date: November 26, 2019Order
Date: October 24, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: December 02, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 17, 2019Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: July 22, 2020Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: December 17, 2019Order Extending Time
Date: February 28, 2020Order Substituting Party
Date: July 23, 2020Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 28, 2020Motion for Substitution of Party(S)
Date: March 12, 2020Request for Copies
Date: March 20, 2018Request for Copies
Date: October 26, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 22, 2018Request to Produce
Date: January 11, 2019Response to Request to Produce
Date: April 16, 2019Response to Request to Produce
Date: June 25, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: September 28, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: May 11, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Acceptance | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Confirmation of Selection for Mediators | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial Calendar Call: 02-28-2022 |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice for/of Trial | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Substituting Party PLAINTIFF |
|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substitution of Party(S) Party: Plaintiff Rosen, Sheri |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.