Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Aquino, Carlos, Aquino, Jaclyn, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Yon, David, Esq., against Safepoint Insurance Company, represented by Parris, Melanie A, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Carlos Aquino and Jaclyn Aquino against Safepoint Insurance Company. The plaintiffs are residents of Broward County, Florida, and the insurance policy in question was issued by Safepoint Insurance Company in the state of Fl...
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 08, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 08, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 08, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 14, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 25, 2018Privilege Log
Date: April 23, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: March 16, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: April 23, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Privilege Log | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Party: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERYParty: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAILParty: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production to Defendant Safepoint Insurance CompanyParty: Plaintiff Aquino, Carlos Plaintiff Aquino, Jaclyn |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Aquino, Carlos Plaintiff Aquino, Jaclyn |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Safepoint Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.