Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Pompano Atlantis Condominium Association Inc., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Tulloch, Ashley Robyn, against Bank Of America N.A., Samborsky, Martha Machado, represented by Ciccio, Matthew A, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Other - $0 - $50,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by the Pompano Atlantis Condominium Association Inc. against Martha Machado Samborsky, Bank of America, N.A., and an unknown tenant. The plaintiff is a condominium association organized to administer the P...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 19, 2018Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted
Date: March 15, 2018Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted
Date: March 15, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: February 13, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: February 20, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: January 30, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 17, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 30, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 30, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted Party: Defendant Samborsky, Martha Machado |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted Unknown Tenant |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
February 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Bank of America N.A. |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time Party: Defendant Bank of America N.A. |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AS COUNSELParty: Defendant Bank of America N.A. |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Defendant Bank of America N.A. |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 01/10/2018Party: Defendant Bank of America N.A. |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) ForeclosureParty: Plaintiff Pompano Atlantis Condominium Association Inc. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.