Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Suntrust Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Winarsky, Amy Jill, against Shuguli, Fausto, represented by Gomez, Alejandro Emilio, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Singer, Michele Towbin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by SunTrust Bank, doing business as LightStream, against the defendant Fausto Shuguli, also known as Fausto R. Shuguli. The complaint alleges three counts: breach of agreement, money lent, and unjust enrichment.
In the first...
Summons Returned Served
Date: January 27, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 05, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: February 15, 2018Affidavit of Costs
Date: March 01, 2018Notice to Defendant of Right Against Garnishment
Date: June 19, 2020Motion to Withdraw
Date: January 15, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 30, 2019Notice
Date: January 30, 2020Motion for Continuing Writ of Garnishment
Date: February 28, 2020Subpoena Returned Unserved
Date: July 12, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: February 04, 2020Answer of Garnishee
Date: March 12, 2020Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: July 15, 2020Request to Produce
Date: July 15, 2020eWrit Issuance - Garnishment
Date: August 21, 2020Motion for Garnishment After Judgment
Date: August 21, 2020Notice of Garnishment to Defendant
Date: September 09, 2020Subpoena Returned Served
Date: February 17, 2021Final Judgment in Garnishment
Date: November 18, 2020Suggestion of Bankruptcy
Date: March 01, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing
Date: January 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: February 08, 2018Affidavit
Date: December 31, 2018Motion
Date: March 22, 2019Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing
Date: February 28, 2020Writ of Garnishment Returned Served
Date: June 23, 2020Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing
Date: August 21, 2020Writ of Garnishment Returned Served
Date: September 08, 2020Answer of Garnishee
Date: September 08, 2020Notice
Date: September 14, 2020Motion for Final Judgment
Date: November 17, 2020Satisfaction of Judgment in Garnishment
Date: January 29, 2021Answer to Writ of Garnishment
Date: June 18, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Suggestion of Bankruptcy Bankruptcy Case No.. 21-21049-PDRParty: Defendant Shuguli, Fausto |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Subpoena Returned Served | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment in Garnishment GARNISHEE, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Judgment in Garnishment | |
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Final Judgment Party: Plaintiff Suntrust Bank |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ANSWER AND NOTICE OF RIGHT TO DISSOLVE WRIT OF GARNISHMENTParty: Plaintiff Suntrust Bank |
|
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Garnishment to Defendant | |
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment Returned Served 4th day of September, 2020 |
|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer of Garnishee /Garnishee, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
eWrit Issuance - Garnishment Garnishee Bank Of America NA Amount $Party: Defendant Shuguli, Fausto |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.