Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Fms Corners Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Salpeter, Eric Todd, against Bhakta, Chetna, Bhakta , Kishor, Mickss Properties Inc, represented by Phelps, Kadisha D, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryRemoval Of Tenant |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/11/2018Party: Defendant Mickss Properties Inc |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/11/2018 (Eviction-5 Days)Party: Defendant Mickss Properties Inc |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Mickss Properties Inc |
|
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Mickss Properties Inc |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: ERIC T. SALPETER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A002770; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: ERIC T. SALPETER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A002770; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint (eFiled) | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Chetna Bhakta (20 Day Summons) |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.