Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Td Auto Finance Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Winarsky, Amy Jill, against Ferguson, Andrew, Parker, Melanie A, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by TD Auto Finance, LLC against defendants Melanie A. Parker and Andrew Ferguson. The complaint alleges two counts: breach of contract and unjust enrichment. In the breach of contract count, TD Auto Finance claims that Gus Mac...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 17, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing
Date: January 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: February 14, 2018Motion for Default & Default
Date: February 14, 2018Affidavit of Costs
Date: May 21, 2018Affidavit
Date: May 21, 2018Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: May 02, 2019eWrit Issuance - Garnishment
Date: August 11, 2021Motion for Garnishment After Judgment
Date: August 11, 2021Writ of Garnishment Returned Served
Date: September 16, 2021Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing
Date: August 11, 2021Answer of Garnishee
Date: September 16, 2021Notice of Garnishment
Date: September 16, 2021Voluntary Dismissal of Garnishment
Date: October 12, 2021Summons Returned Unserved
Date: May 09, 2018Claim of Exemption and Request for Hearing
Date: October 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal of Garnishment GARNISHEE: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Claim of Exemption and Request for Hearing | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment Returned Served 15th day of September, 2021 |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF GARNISHEE AND DEMAND TO PLAINTIFF FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Garnishment | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
eWrit Issuance - Garnishment Garnishee: Bank of America NA/ Deft: Melanie A Parker/ $ 26,212.17 |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Garnishment After Judgment Garnishee: Bank of America NA/ Deft: Melanie A Parker/ $ 26,212.17Party: Plaintiff TD Auto Finance LLC |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing | |
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Costs |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.