Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
The Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sinai, Shannon Troutman, against Butler Farms Homeowners Association Inc, Larracuente, Elina M, Larracuente, Robert, Us Specialty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a mortgage foreclosure action filed by The Bank of New York Mellon, also known as The Bank of New York, as the trustee for Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-FRE1. The defendants in this case are Elina M. Larracuente, also known as Elina L...
Value Claim Form
Date: January 06, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 06, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 06, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 06, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 06, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 09, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 09, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 09, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 09, 2018Notice Setting Non-Jury Trial
Date: March 21, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 06, 2018Lis Pendens
Date: January 06, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 06, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 06, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 06, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 09, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 09, 2018Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic
Date: March 13, 2018Default
Date: March 14, 2018Motion for Default
Date: March 14, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: March 14, 2018Order Setting
Date: March 23, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting non-jury trial 09-18-2018 |
|
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice Setting Non-Jury Trial | |
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default againstParty: Defendant Larracuente, Robert Defendant Larracuente, Elina M Defendant US Specialty Insurance Company Defendant Butler Farms Homeowners Association Inc |
|
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Party: Plaintiff The Bank of New York Mellon |
|
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Non-Military Affidavit | |
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic | |
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved UNKNOWN PARTY #2 |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved UNKNOWN PARTY #1 |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 5th day of February, 2018Party: Defendant US Specialty Insurance Company |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 2/9/2018Party: Defendant Larracuente, Robert |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.