Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Sunrise Lakes Condominium Apartments, filed a(n) Condominium - Property case represented by Tulloch, Ashley Robyn, against Toro, Virginia, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haury, William W., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryCondominium Action |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeCondominium |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Sunrise Lakes Condominium Apartments Phase 3, Inc. 3 against Virginia Toro and an unknown tenant. The plaintiff is a condominium association and is seeking to foreclose a claim of lien for assessments o...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Returned Served 1/2/19Party: Defendant Toro, Virginia |
|
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued to Plaintiff HB to Plaintiff |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Check Paid to JOHN TORO per ord ($3,712.31); ALFREDO TORO($3,712.30); mailed to atty; BRENDA D FORMAN CLERK $3000 |
|
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Copy Probate (18003705) ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION rNSTRUCTION TO BROWARD COUNTY CLERK OF COURT TO DSTRIBUTE FUNDS IN COURT REGISTRY |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title & Certificate of Disbursement Mailed | |
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title & Certificate of Disbursement Emailed | |
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Check Paid TO SUNRISE LAKES CONDO APARTMENTS PHASE 3 INC 3 BY CERT ($7,077.54) MAILED TO ATTY; KAYE BENDER REMAUM PL ($3,639.85) MAILED; BRENDA D FORMAN CLERK ($28.00) CLERK FEES |
|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale & Proof of Publication Mailed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.